HIGH LEVEL APPROXIMATION FOR IBPS PO AND IBPS CLERK PRELIMS 2018

HIGH LEVEL APPROXIMATION FOR IBPS PO AND IBPS CLERK PRELIMS 2018|| HIGH LEVEL APPROXIMATION PDF HINDI 2018||

Directions: Find the approximate value which should come in place of Question mark (?) in the following question.
दिशानिर्देश: निम्नलिखित प्रश्न में प्रश्न चिह्न (?) के स्थान पर आने वाले अनुमानित मूल्य का पता लगाएं।

1 27.003 × 4.99 × (145.003 ÷ 28.97) – (12.001 × 3.94) + 127.03 – 29.14 = ?
678
725
789
925
806
B
? ≈ 27 × 5 × 145  – 12 × 4 + 127 – 29
29

≈ 135 × 5 – 48 + 127 – 29

= 675 – 48 + 127 – 29

= 802 – 77 = 725

Hence, option B is correct.

2 20.01 × 1024 + 159 = ?2 + 536
10
16
21
26
35
B

20.01 × 1024 + 159 = ?2 + 536

20 × 1024 + 159 = ?2 + 536

20 × 32 + 159 = ?2 + 536

640 + 159 = ?2 + 536

799 – 536 = ?2

?2 = 263

? = 16.21 ≈ 16

Hence, option B is correct.

3 25.1% of 5902 = ? × 55.96 ÷ 3.82 × 20
1
2
3
5
7
D

25.1 % of 5902 = ? × 55.96 ÷ 3.82 ×20

= 5902 × 1  = ? × 56 ÷ 4 × 20
4

1476 ÷ 14 ÷ 20 = ?

? = 5.27 ≈ 5

Hence, option D is correct.

4 53.15% of 426 – 30.45% of 745 = ?2 – 512 – 1600
08
15
24
27
60
C

53.15% of 426 – 30.45% of 745 = ?2 – 512 – 1600

53% of 426 – 30% of 745 = ?2 – 512 – 40

225.78 – 223.5 + 512 + 40 = ?2

?2 = 226 – 223 + 512 + 40

?= 555

?2 = 23.55 ≈ 24

Hence. option C is correct.

5 27.031 × 328.001 + 37.081 – ? = 2628.31 + 37.035 – 36.745 × 4.125
5008
6302
6376
5306
6478
C
27 × 328 + 37 – ? ≈ 2628 + 37 – 37 × 4
Or, ? ≈ (27 × 328 + 37) – (2628 + 37 – 37 × 4) = ( 8856 + 37) – (2665 – 148)
= 8893 – 2517 = 6376
Hence, option C is correct.
6
1535 √35 + 20% of ? – 124.15 of   1  = 6960
9
10490
– 10490
15490
10590
10450
B
1535 35 + 20% of ? – 124.15 of 1  = 6960
9
or, 1535 × 5.916 + ? × 1 – 124 × 1  = 6960
5 9
or, 9071.85 + ?  – 13.77 = 6960
5
Or, ≈ 9072 + ?  – 14 = 6960
5
Or, ?  ≈ 6960 + 14 – 9072 = 6974 – 9072
5
Or, ?  = – 2098
5

Or, ? = – 2098 × 5 = – 10490

Hence, opton B is correct.

7
162.13 × 9 – (10648)  = 5
16 × 14 + 245 + (?)2
13
16
19
22
25
A
162.13 × 9 – (10648) = 5
16 × 14 + 245 + (?)2
= 1458 – 22  = 5
224 + 245 + (?)2
= 1436  = 5
469 + (?)2

1436 = 5 × (469 + (?)2)

1436 = 2345 + 5 × (?)2

5 × (?)2 = – 909

(?)2 ≈ – 181

(?)2 = 13.452

(?) ≈ 13

Hence, option A is correct
8
(3026.001) + (12.969)2 = ? ÷   6
23.892
42
45
56
62
67
C
(3026.001) + (12.969)2 = ? ÷ 6
23.892
Or, ? ≈ (3025) + (13)2 × 6
24
Or, ? = (55 + 169) × 6
24
224 × 6  = 56
24
Hence, option C is correct
9
25.12 × 152.94 + 5142 – 6336.83  = ?
√360
139
119
209
154
148
A
25.12 × 152.94 + 5142 – 6336.83  = ?
√360
? = 25.12 × 152.64 + 5142 – 6336.83
√361
25 ×153 + 5142 – 6337
√360
3825 + 5142 – 6337
19
= 8967 – 6337
19
= 7630
19

= 138.42 ≈ 139

Hence, option A is correct.
10
82.958 × 22.001 – 16.04 × 3.11  = ?
(9.002)2 –  √145 + (16.997)2
1
3
9
7
5
E
82.958 × 22.001 – 16.04 × 3.11  = ?
(9.002)2 –  √145 + (16.997)2
= ? 82.958 × 22.001 – 16.04 × 3.11
(9.002)2 –  √145 + (16.997)2
or, ? ≈ 83 × 22 – 16 × 3  = 1826 – 48
81 – √144 + 289 81 – 12 + 289
= 1778  = 1778  = 4.966 ≈ 5
370 – 12  358

Hence, option E is correct.

11 56.99 × 56.02 + 789.998 – 54.9 + 123.33 = ?
4560
4650
4050
4540
5040
C
56.99 × 56.02 + 789.998 – 54.9 + 123.33
? ≈ 57 × 56 + 790 – 55 + 123
? ≈ 3192 + 790 – 55 + 123
? ≈ 4105 – 55
? ≈ 4050
Hence, option (C) is correct.
12. 35.85% of 569.9 + 35.9% of 450.2 = ?
357
367
377
380
355
B

35.85% of 569.9 + 35.9% of 450.2

≈ 36% × 570 + 36% × 450

? ≈ 36  × 570 + 36  × 450
100 100

? ≈ 205.2 + 162

? ≈ 367.2

? ≈ 367

Hence, option (B) is correct.

13. √783.99 × √169.123 + 49.9% of 300 = ? × 9.8
49
51
58
55
60
B

√783.99 × √169.123 + 49.9% of 300 = ? × 9.8

⇒ √784 × √169 + 50  × 300 ≈ ? × 10
100

⇒ 28 × 13 + 150 ≈ ? × 10

⇒ ? ≈ 514  = 51.4
10

⇒ ? ≈ 51

Hence, option (B) is correct.

14 .(7.03)2 + (9.03)2 – 9.88% of 554.99 = ? – 125.01
190
182
175
200
225
D
(7.03)2 + (9.03)2 – 9.88% of 554.99 = ? – 125.01
⇒ 49 + 81 – 10  × 555 + 125 ≈ ?
100
⇒ ? ≈ 130 – 55.5 + 125 = 199.5
∴ ? ≈ 200
Hence, option (D) is correct.
15 (√1224.889 × 16.23) ÷ 4.99 × 4 = ?
504
410
450
362
E350
C

(√1224.889 × 16.23) ÷ 4.99 × 4

? ≈ (√1225 × 16) ÷ 5 × 4

? ≈ 35 × 16  × 4
5

? ≈ 112 × 4 = 448

∴  ? ≈ 450

Hence, option (C) is correct.

 DOWNLOAD PDF HERE